Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/07/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/07/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/07/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 10/07/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/07/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/07/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/07/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/07/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/07/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/07/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/07/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 10/07/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/08/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/08/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 10/08/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 10/08/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 10/10/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/10/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/10/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/10/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 10/14/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 10/14/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/14/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 10/28/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/29/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/13/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/02/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/09/2014