Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/20/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/18/2014