Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 11/13/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/18/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/29/2014