Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/12/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/20/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/31/2014