Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2014