Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/29/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/20/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/02/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/03/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/10/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/12/2014