Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/08/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/29/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/03/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/12/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/07/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 05/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/20/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/28/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/28/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/30/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/26/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/09/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/17/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/31/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/09/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/09/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/16/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/20/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/01/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/02/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/02/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/03/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 12/03/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/08/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 12/10/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 12/10/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/10/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/11/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/12/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 01/02/2015