Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/22/2013
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/08/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 01/16/2014