Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/28/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/07/2014