Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/20/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/27/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/27/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/08/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/14/2014