Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2014