Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/22/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 12/03/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 01/08/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/25/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/29/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/01/2014