Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/14/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/16/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/17/2014