Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/03/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 12/03/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/06/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/21/2014