Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/16/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/09/2013