Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/23/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/08/2014