Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/04/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/14/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/12/2014