Refine your search

9 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
06/30/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-122.
06/30/2014 Signed by President.
06/25/2014 Presented to President.
06/23/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 379 - 3 (Roll no. 340).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5605)
05/22/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3307-3308; text as passed Senate: CR S3308)
06/27/2013 Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-69.
02/12/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H441)
02/04/2013 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-7.
01/18/2013 Introduced in House