Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/20/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/27/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/27/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/18/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/27/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/06/2014