Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 09/23/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 10/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/02/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/16/2013