Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/29/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/14/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/18/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/05/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 12/05/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/03/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 07/31/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/13/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/03/2014