Refine your search

Refined by:

Alabama Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/10/2014