Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/30/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/02/2014