Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/30/2013
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/04/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/10/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/10/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/16/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/12/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 12/05/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/16/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/29/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/01/2014