Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 01/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/27/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 03/05/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/23/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/23/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/04/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/12/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/11/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/28/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/08/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/28/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/28/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/30/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/24/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/28/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/11/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/16/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/13/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/13/2014