Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 09/25/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/13/2014