Refine your search

45 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
03/24/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
03/13/2014-5:43pm House The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:43pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:43pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 174 (Roll no. 132).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:36pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 183 - 227 (Roll no. 131). (consideration: CR H2407)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:29pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H2407)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:24pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kirkpatrick motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to clarify that nothing in the underlying legislation may prohibit the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Agriculture from (1) protecting Tribal treaty rights; (2) preserving recreational fishing; (3) mitigating drought conditions in an area covered by an emergency drought declaration; or (4) facilitating fire suppression.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:23pm House Mrs. Kirkpatrick moved to recommit with instructions to Natural Resources. (consideration: CR H2406-2407; text: CR H2406)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:23pm House The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2395-2396)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:22pm House The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 3189.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:22pm House H.Amdt.597 On agreeing to the Polis amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 175 - 236 (Roll no. 130). (consideration: CR H2405-2406)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:16pm House UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of an amendment which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:16pm House The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-5:15pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2405-2408)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-4:14pm House Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 3189 as unfinished business.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-4:13pm House On motion that the Committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-4:13pm House Mr. Hastings (WA) moved that the Committee rise.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-4:13pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINS - At the conclusion of debate on the Polis Part A substitute amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Polis demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:50pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 515, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Polis Part A amendment no. 3.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:50pm House H.Amdt.597 Amendment (A003) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Polis. (consideration: CR H2398-2401, H2405-2406; text: CR H2398)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:50pm House H.Amdt.596 On agreeing to the Mullin amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:43pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 515, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Mullin Part A amendment no. 2.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:43pm House H.Amdt.596 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Mullin. (consideration: CR H2397-2398; text: CR H2397)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:43pm House H.Amdt.595 On agreeing to the Tipton amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:32pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 515, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Tipton Part A amendment no. 1.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-3:32pm House H.Amdt.595 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Tipton. (consideration: CR H2396-2397; text: CR H2396)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-2:26pm House GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 3189.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-2:25pm House The Speaker designated the Honorable Virginia Foxx to act as Chairwoman of the Committee.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-2:25pm House House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 515 and Rule XVIII.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-2:25pm House The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3189. The rule makes in order as original text for the purpose of amendment an amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Natural Resources now printed in the bill and provides that it shall be considered as read. The rule provides for a closed rule for H.R. 4015 with one hour of debate on the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/13/2014-2:25pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 515. (consideration: CR H2385-2401)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/12/2014-7:24pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 515 Reported to House. The resolution provides for one hour of debate on H.R. 3189. The rule makes in order as original text for the purpose of amendment an amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Natural Resources now printed in the bill and provides that it shall be considered as read. The rule provides for a closed rule for H.R. 4015 with one hour of debate on the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
03/04/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 278.
Type of Action: Calendars
03/04/2014 House Committee on Agriculture discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
03/04/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-372, Part I.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
11/14/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
11/14/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
11/14/2013 House Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
10/10/2013 House Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans
10/04/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Agriculture
10/02/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Natural Resources
09/26/2013 House Referred to House Agriculture
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
09/26/2013 House Referred to House Natural Resources
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
09/26/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
09/26/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral