Refine your search

14 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
10/31/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-47. (TXT | PDF)
Type of Action: To President
10/31/2013 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
10/31/2013 House Presented to President.
10/31/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/30/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7685)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/15/2013 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/15/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
10/14/2013-7:23pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/14/2013-7:23pm House On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6579-6580)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/14/2013-7:22pm House Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6579-6580)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/14/2013 House Committee on Judiciary discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
10/14/2013-7:22pm House Mr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
09/26/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
09/26/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral