There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2013

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2013

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the continued performance of the functions of the United States Parole Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/31/2013Became Public Law No: 113-47. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/2013Signed by President.
10/31/2013Presented to President.
10/30/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7685)
10/14/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H6579-6580)
10/14/2013Committee on Judiciary discharged.
09/26/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
10/31/2013Became Public Law No: 113-47. (TXT | PDF)
10/31/2013Signed by President.
10/31/2013HousePresented to President.
10/31/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/30/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7685)
10/15/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/15/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/14/2013-7:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/14/2013-7:23pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6579-6580)
10/14/2013-7:22pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6579-6580)
10/14/2013HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
10/14/2013-7:22pmHouseMr. Goodlatte asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
09/26/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/26/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/26/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/26/2013 Referred to
10/14/2013 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations10/15/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3190.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3190. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-47 (10/31/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

United States Parole Commission Extension Act of 2013 - Extends the United States Parole Commission for five years.

Directs the Commission, within 180 days after enactment of this Act, to report the following, for FY2012-FY2013, with regard to each type of case over which it has jurisdiction: (1) the number of offenders; (2) the number of hearings, record reviews, and National Appeals Board considerations conducted by the Commission; (3) the number of hearings conducted by the Commission by type of hearing; (4) the number of record reviews conducted by the Commission by type of consideration; (5) the number of warrants issued and executed compared to the number requested; (6) the number of revocation determinations by the Commission; (7) the distribution of initial offenses; (8) the distribution of subsequent offenses; (9) the percentage of offenders paroled or re-paroled compared with the percentage of offenders continued to expiration of sentence; (10) the percentage of cases in which the primary and secondary examiner disagreed on the appropriate disposition of the case, the release conditions to be imposed, or the reasons for the decision; (11) the percentage of revocation and non-revocation hearings in which the offender is accompanied by a representative; (12) the number of administrative appeals and the action of the National Appeals Board in relation to those appeals; and (13) the Commission's annual expenditures for offenders.

Directs the Commission to report on: (1) the percentage of decisions within, above, or below its decision guidelines for federal initial hearings and federal and D.C. Code revocation hearings; (2) the projected number of federal offenders that will be under its jurisdiction as of October 31, 2018; (3) an estimate of the date on which no federal offenders will remain under its jurisdiction; and (4) its annual expenditures, including travel expenses and the annual salaries of its members and staff.

Requires the Commission to make such reports for each of FY2014-FY2018 within 90 days after the end of the fiscal year.

Directs the Commission, within 180 days after enactment of this Act, to report on: (1) the parole failure rate for the District of Columbia for the preceding fiscal year, (2) the factors that caused that rate, and (3) remedial measures that might be undertaken to reduce that rate.