Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/26/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 09/30/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 10/29/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/26/2014