There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Student Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to direct the Secretary of Education to make grants to States for assistance in hiring additional school-based mental health and student service providers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
01/18/2013Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/05/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/05/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/05/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/13/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/13/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/13/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/15/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/25/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/28/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce01/18/2013 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education04/23/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.320.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.320. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/18/2013)

Student Support Act - Amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to require the Secretary of Education to make matching grants of at least $1 million to states for allocation to local educational agencies (LEAs) so that additional school-based mental health and student service providers may be hired, thereby reducing the student-to-provider ratios in elementary and secondary schools to specified minimum levels recommended by the leading counseling, guidance, and mental health organizations.

Sets those minimum ratios at: (1) 1 school counselor for every 250 students, (2) 1 school psychologist for every 1,000 students, and (3) 1 school social worker for every 250 students.

Requires grants to states and state allocations to LEAs to be made pursuant to specified formulas that take into account a state's and school district's share of children in poverty.