Refine your search

6 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
11/27/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-54.
11/27/2013 Signed by President.
11/21/2013 Presented to President.
11/18/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/28/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5946-5960)
09/27/2013 Introduced in House