Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 09/27/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 09/27/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 09/30/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/03/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/28/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/13/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 11/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/02/2013