Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 01/25/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/25/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/29/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/29/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 01/29/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/05/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/06/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/14/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 07/23/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/12/2013