There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Pay Our Military Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pay Our Military Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pay Our Military Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Pay Our Military Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making continuing appropriations for military pay in the event of a Government shutdown.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/30/2013Became Public Law No: 113-39. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2013Signed by President.
09/30/2013Presented to President.
09/30/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7018)
09/29/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 423 - 0 (Roll no. 499).(text: CR 9/28/2013 H6002)
09/28/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/30/2013Became Public Law No: 113-39. (TXT | PDF)
09/30/2013Signed by President.
09/30/2013HousePresented to President.
09/30/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7018)
09/29/2013-12:24amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/29/2013-12:24amHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 423 - 0 (Roll no. 499). (text: CR 9/28/2013 H6002)
09/29/2013-12:18amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR 9/28/2013 H6009-6010)
09/28/2013-11:45pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3210, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Kingston demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question on passage of the bill until a time to be announced.
09/28/2013-11:44pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6008)
09/28/2013-10:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 40 minutes of debate on H.R. 3210.
09/28/2013-10:55pmHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of a motion to concur in the Senate amendment to H.J. Res. 59 with each of two amendments printed in the report of the Committee on Rules. The resolution provides for one hour of debate and provides that the question of adoption of the motion shall be divided between the two House amendments. The resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 3210. The resolution provides for 40 minutes of debate and one motion to recommit.
09/28/2013-10:55pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 366. (consideration: CR H6002-6008)
09/28/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
09/28/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 09/28/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations09/28/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-39 (09/30/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Pay Our Military Act - Appropriates for FY2014, out of any money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, for any period during which interim or full-year appropriations for FY2014 are not in effect, such sums as are necessary to provide pay and allowances to: (1) members of the Armed Forces, including reserve components, who perform active service during such period; and (2) civilian personnel and contractors of the Department of Defense (DOD) (and the Department of Homeland Security [DHS] in the case of the Coast Guard) whom the Secretary concerned determines are providing support to such members of the Armed Forces.

Requires the appropriations and funds made available and authority granted pursuant to this Act to remain available until whichever of the following first occurs: (1) enactment of an appropriation (including a continuing appropriation) for any purpose for which amounts are made available in this Act, (2) enactment of the applicable regular or continuing appropriations resolution or other Act without any appropriation for such purpose, or (3) January 1, 2015.