Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/28/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 09/28/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/28/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/11/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/14/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/14/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/28/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/12/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/19/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/05/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/10/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 12/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/14/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/08/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/19/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/20/2014