Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/01/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/02/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/04/2013