Refine your search

Refined by:

New Jersey Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/01/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/01/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/04/2013