Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/01/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/01/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/02/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 10/02/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/02/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/03/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/03/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 10/03/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/03/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/04/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/04/2013