Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/01/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/01/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/04/2013