Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 09/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/03/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 10/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/03/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 10/03/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/03/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/03/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/03/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/03/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 10/04/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/04/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/04/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/04/2013