Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
07/12/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-16.
07/12/2013 Signed by President.
07/02/2013 Presented to President.
06/27/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/27/2013 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5509-5510)
05/21/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 165).(text: CR H2817-2818)
01/18/2013 Introduced in House