Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 11/13/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 11/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/18/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 11/18/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/18/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/26/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/04/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/05/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/12/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/14/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/25/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/07/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/18/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/18/2014