Refine your search

33 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
02/04/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-3. (TXT | PDF)
Type of Action: To President
02/04/2013 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
02/04/2013 House Presented to President.
01/31/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 64 - 34. Record Vote Number: 11.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate Motion by Senator Vitter to commit to Senate Committee on Finance with instructions tabled in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 10.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.9 Motion to table amendment SA 9 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 79 - 19. Record Vote Number: 9.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.8 Motion to table amendment SA 8 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 53 - 45. Record Vote Number: 8.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.7 Motion to table amendment SA 7 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 52 - 46. Record Vote Number: 7.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.6 Motion to table amendment SA 6 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54 - 44. Record Vote Number: 6.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.9 Amendment SA 9 proposed by Senator Paul. (consideration: CR S424-425, S427-428; text: CR S424)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.8 Amendment SA 8 proposed by Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S417-423, S427; text: CR S418)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.7 Amendment SA 7 proposed by Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S414-417, S426; text: CR S415)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate S.Amdt.6 Amendment SA 6 proposed by Senator Portman. (consideration: CR S414-417, S425-426; text: CR S414-415)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/31/2013 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S413-426, S426-429)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/28/2013 Senate Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 7.
Type of Action: Calendars
01/24/2013 Senate Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
Type of Action: Calendars
01/23/2013-1:23pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-1:23pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 285 - 144 (Roll no. 30). (text: CR H237)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-1:13pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 151 - 277 (Roll no. 29). (consideration: CR H249-250)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-12:46pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H249)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-12:37pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Murphy (FL) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment inserting a new section pertaining to Protecting Veterans, Troops, and Seniors from Benefit Cuts and Cost Increases.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-12:37pm House Mr. Murphy (FL) moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means. (consideration: CR H248; text: CR H248)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-12:37pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H248)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-11:11am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 325.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-11:11am House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 325 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The resolution provides that the amendment printed in the report shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended shall be considered as read. The resolution waives all points of order against provisions in the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-11:10am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 39. (consideration: CR H237-260)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/23/2013-11:02am House Rule H. Res. 39 passed House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/22/2013-5:12pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 39 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 325 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The resolution waives all points of order against consideration of the bill. The resolution provides that the amendment printed in the report shall be considered as adopted and the bill, as amended shall be considered as read. The resolution waives all points of order against provisions in the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
01/21/2013 House Referred to House Administration
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
01/21/2013 House Referred to House Ways and Means
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
01/21/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
01/21/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral