There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1303(b)(3) of Public Law 111-148 concerning the notice requirements regarding the extent of health plan coverage of abortion and abortion premium surcharges.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/09/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
10/11/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/09/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/09/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (141)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 10/09/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/10/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 10/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 10/11/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 10/11/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 10/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/14/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/14/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 10/14/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 10/16/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/16/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 10/28/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/29/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 11/20/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/05/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/15/2014
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/18/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/29/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/13/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/09/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health10/11/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3279. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/09/2013)

Abortion Insurance Full Disclosure Act of 2013 - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, with respect to abortion coverage in qualified plans offered through a Health Benefit Exchange, to modify the notice rules to require that:

  • in the case of services regarding abortions both for which public funding is prohibited and allowed, the extent of coverage shall be prominently displayed in any marketing or advertising materials, comparison tools, or summary of benefits and coverage explanation made available by the issuer of the plan, by an Exchange, or by the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS), including information made available through an Internet portal or Exchange; and
  • in the case of abortions for which public funding is prohibited and where the premium for the plan is disclosed, the surcharge attributable to such services, consisting of an amount equal to the actuarial value of the coverage, shall be disclosed and identified separately.