Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/10/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 11/13/2014