Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/10/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/15/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 11/13/2014