Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/16/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/16/2014