Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 10/09/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/10/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 10/10/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/14/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/14/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/29/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/05/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/18/2014