Text: H.R.3284 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/10/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3284


To ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until December 31, 2014.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

October 10, 2013

Mr. Levin introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To ensure the complete and timely payment of the obligations of the United States Government until December 31, 2014.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Default Prevention Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. Ensuring timely payment.

Section 2 of the No Budget, No Pay Act of 2013 (31 U.S.C. 3101 note) is amended—

(1) by striking “date of the enactment of this Act” each place it appears and inserting “date of enactment of the Default Prevention Act of 2013”;

(2) in subsection (a), by striking “May 18, 2013” and inserting “December 31, 2014”; and

(3) in subsection (b), by striking “May 19, 2013” each place it appears and inserting “January 1, 2015”.